ST EDMUNDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 1118103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £29.76k £31.26k £29.97k £26.17k £21.39k
Total expenditure £16.71k £14.02k £20.43k £27.35k £21.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.70k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A