ST EDMUNDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 1118103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vrajlal Kataria Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Daniel Matthew Turpin Trustee 27 January 2021
FIGURING IT OUT Overdue by 515 days
JOHN HARLAND Trustee 06 December 2020
ASPIRATIONS SOUTHEND Received: On time
Ron Wright Trustee 20 April 2016 None on record
Susan Jane Carr Trustee 22 April 2015 None on record