THROUGHCARE HOUSING & SUPPORT LTD

Charity number: 1117761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 02 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 02 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 20 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 23 December 2019 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 23 December 2019 84 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 22 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 26 October 2017 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 26 October 2017 26 days late Download