THROUGHCARE HOUSING & SUPPORT LTD

Charity number: 1117761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £428.76k £375.68k £354.21k £354.72k £328.96k
Total expenditure £450.14k £386.30k £333.58k £334.08k £375.24k
Income from government contracts £428.76k £375.63k £349.51k £354.72k £328.96k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A