Financial history CHALFONTS BEEKEEPERS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1121231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £25.19k £15.95k £15.95k £12.49k £7.27k
Total expenditure £23.06k £17.79k £17.79k £11.48k £6.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A