Financial history LONDON SIKH CENTRE (EALING)

Charity number: 1118356
Charity reporting is overdue by 495 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £284.55k £255.70k £323.21k £409.63k £281.02k
Total expenditure £138.30k £211.49k £227.71k £292.76k £219.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A