ST AUSTIN'S SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118091
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £15.38k £15.14k £11.78k £14.96k £16.49k
Total expenditure £8.73k £20.48k £6.59k £8.05k £15.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A