SEAPOINT CANOE CENTRE

Charity number: 1122984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 March 2020 13 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 March 2020 13 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 04 March 2019 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 March 2018 03 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 March 2018 03 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 04 March 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 March 2017 24 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 04 March 2016 06 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 March 2016 06 December 2016 On time Download