JALALIA MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1119082
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 July 2020 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 20 July 2020 50 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 05 July 2019 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 05 July 2019 35 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 21 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 21 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 19 May 2016 On time Download