JALALIA MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1119082
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £66.55k £58.67k £65.87k £152.92k £88.76k
Total expenditure £58.42k £66.27k £78.04k £97.08k £53.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A