Accounts and annual returns CITY UNITED LTD

Charity number: 1121305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window