NEW INITIATIVES YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1121523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.13k £776 £5.71k £15.04k £1.61k
Total expenditure £23.69k £14.68k £15.93k £13.38k £9.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A