Financial history GIRLS SCHOOL AFRICA

Charity number: 1119449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/12/2017 09/12/2018 09/12/2019 09/12/2020 09/12/2021
Total gross income £34 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £135 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A