IST BURES SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1118781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £25.94k £22.08k £38.65k £37.13k £33.85k
Total expenditure £18.70k £22.02k £35.09k £29.13k £33.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.25k N/A N/A N/A