Financial history ST THOMAS MAR THOMA CHURCH, BRISTOL

Charity number: 1122211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £249.29k £161.20k £127.24k £159.99k £126.58k
Total expenditure £86.08k £100.58k £103.72k £119.43k £100.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A