Trustees ST THOMAS MAR THOMA CHURCH, BRISTOL
Charity number: 1122211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saji Mathew Treasurer | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vineeth P Kunju GSC PG Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annie Cherian SevSan Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jinie Sam SunSch Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Saji John YouFel Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Samuel Lay Leader | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Niravathu Vice Pres. | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Reji Abraham YD PG Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mency John Mathew NB PG Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kolekulangara Vilayil oommen John Mandalam | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUNIL K DANIEL Accountant | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALEX PRASAD ABRAHAM EM EC Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHNSON CHACKO PUTHENVEETTIL TP PG Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANALYSE Pallivathukal George SEB PG Rep | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
BIJU PALACKAMANNIL ABRAHAM BATH PGRep | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
SANU SAMUEL Assy/Choir | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jaffey Chacko SECRETARY | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SAM KANDATHUMKUZHIYIL VARUGHESE Lay Leader | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.