ABILITY NORTH LONDON

Charity number: 1121171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 November 2019 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 November 2019 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 May 2017 On time Download