ABILITY NORTH LONDON

Charity number: 1121171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £151.24k £120.80k £150.34k £154.59k £247.59k
Total expenditure £94.30k £99.21k £119.00k £130.60k £201.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.25k £0 N/A N/A £5.00k