ROTHERFIELD ST MARTIN

Charity number: 1119458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 13 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 13 June 2017 On time Download