PEN GREEN CENTRE

Charity number: 1122618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £362.58k £359.12k £114.18k £26.56k £743.47k
Total expenditure £386.93k £364.07k £115.94k £28.41k £748.87k
Income from government contracts £362.55k N/A N/A N/A £70.50k
Income from government grants £0 £359.10k £114.15k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £90.32k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £653.15k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £7
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £95.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £653.15k