Financial history IRANIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1120205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £251.85k £260.92k £263.98k £296.75k £258.81k
Total expenditure £248.96k £259.70k £249.05k £270.08k £232.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.15k N/A N/A N/A N/A