ST GEORGE'S DAY CENTRE (BOLTON) LTD

Charity number: 1124588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £163.14k £167.00k £162.49k £164.00k £214.37k
Total expenditure £180.60k £166.76k £167.00k £166.48k £123.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £114.22k £114.22k £114.22k £116.08k £59.55k