WETMORE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1118632
Charity reporting is overdue by 1493 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 396 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 396 days
Annual return 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 763 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 763 days
Annual return 28 February 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1128 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1128 days
Annual return 28 February 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1493 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1493 days