The Abraham Initiatives

Charity number: 1119571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 December 2019 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 December 2019 48 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time Download