The Abraham Initiatives

Charity number: 1119571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £109.17k £228.87k £241.30k £251.06k £187.77k
Total expenditure £90.86k £214.76k £171.92k £199.41k £312.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A