SUTTON ON TRENT YOUTH CLUB TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1119235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 06 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 23 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required