SUTTON ON TRENT YOUTH CLUB TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1119235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £1.41k £2.92k £2.97k £4.20k £1.31k
Total expenditure £0 £575 £310 £15.92k £150
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A