REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD PRECIOUS PEOPLE PARISH

Charity number: 1119343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 November 2017 On time Download