REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD PRECIOUS PEOPLE PARISH

Charity number: 1119343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £196.78k £180.52k £196.39k £226.41k £190.61k
Total expenditure £197.47k £164.71k £187.99k £214.32k £180.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A