THE LADY ROTHES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1119157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £46.99k £42.43k £51.57k £58.01k £68.56k
Total expenditure £38.73k £38.00k £61.62k £62.15k £63.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A