C3 TRUST UK

Charity number: 1119791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.73m £4.95m £6.27m £7.14m £8.96m
Total expenditure £3.36m £4.50m £5.56m £7.24m £8.30m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £4.14m £6.13m
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.72m £1.82m £2.22m £2.24m £2.31m
Income - Other trading activities £106.48k £113.61k £114.50k £107.24k £103.67k
Income - Charitable activities £1.90m £3.01m £3.93m £4.68m £6.55m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.28k £5.61k £5.33k £5.38k £3.94k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £102.50k £852
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.19m £4.32m £5.38m £7.05m £8.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £174.62k £184.49k £178.63k £188.64k £171.23k
Expenditure - Governance £2.50k £2.55k £2.55k £3.40k £3.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.40k £0 £0 £1.19k £2.30k