THE BOXING ACADEMY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1119931
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £867.81k £669.87k £100.73k £98.42k £46.81k
Total expenditure £851.36k £789.23k £83.24k £80.68k £27.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £38.86k £99.88k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £357.86k £197.32k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £502.10k £472.44k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £214 £55 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £7.64k £50 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £836.92k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £789.23k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £14.44k £0 N/A N/A N/A