NORTH CHESHIRE JEWISH NURSERY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1119430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 October 2020 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 October 2020 104 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 04 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 07 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 04 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 April 2017 On time Download