BLAEN BRAN COMMUNITY WOODLAND

Charity number: 1120995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 November 2020 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 November 2020 387 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 November 2020 751 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 November 2020 1116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required