THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS' CHURCH KEMPSTON

Charity number: 1119051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £1.56k £1.93k £1.54k £1.54k £2.17k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £6.06k £60 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A