Trustees COTSWOLD EDGE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1127669
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henry Park | Trustee | 30 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Chandler | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arnold Tucker | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
YVONNE ANDOW | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Newton | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robson | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dean Ashpole-Chapman | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Bryden | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Harris | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVE SPOKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK JOHN FORWARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.