SOUTH PEOPLE'S PROJECTS (SOPPRO)

Charity number: 1120469
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required