Financial history ST VINCENT'S SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1124978
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £24.66k £27.83k £24.71k £32.15k £15.26k
Total expenditure £15.58k £14.44k £28.44k £12.18k £25.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A