WARD END COMMUNITY COLLEGE

Charity number: 1120769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 November 2016 On time Download