WARD END COMMUNITY COLLEGE

Charity number: 1120769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £60.49k £55.77k £19.84k £8.23k £13.30k
Total expenditure £64.30k £52.11k £21.58k £6.78k £11.75k
Income from government contracts £43.75k £55.77k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.74k £0 N/A N/A £10.00k