OXFORD SHAKESPEARE ENSEMBLE

Charity number: 1119379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £664.20k £735.59k £769.41k £759.02k £768.35k
Total expenditure £680.70k £766.09k £781.41k £824.19k £882.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £33.39k £20.00k £1.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £34.26k £68.30k £65.46k £50.85k £70.13k
Income - Other trading activities £22.96k £29.98k £25.70k £25.08k £0
Income - Charitable activities £606.21k £636.97k £678.00k £682.90k £697.77k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £773 £338 £247 £191 £450
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £626.10k £711.65k £724.56k £751.53k £806.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.25k £15.76k £14.63k £15.40k £76.42k
Expenditure - Governance £4.20k £4.20k £4.20k £4.20k £4.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £41.35k £38.68k £42.21k £57.26k £0