CANOE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1121456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £4.36k £3.79k £5.00k £5.42k £4.35k
Total expenditure £86.59k £229 £7.65k £6.87k £6.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A