BILLINGSHURST EMERGENCY ASSISTANCE TEAM

Charity number: 1119641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £8.23k £1.97k £752 £1.52k £6.16k
Total expenditure £7.01k £7.48k £3.77k £0 £15.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A