Financial history HOLY CROSS PTA

Charity number: 1123676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £12.00k £11.77k £14.81k £9.64k £4.13k
Total expenditure £8.11k £4.67k £7.08k £4.86k £2.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A