THE AARONS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1119359
Charity reporting is up to date (104 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 13 July 2021 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 13 July 2021 104 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 06 October 2020 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 06 October 2020 189 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 05 April 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 05 April 2019 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 09 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 07 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required