ALMIS WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1120660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/05/2016 01/05/2017 01/05/2018 01/05/2019 01/05/2020
Total gross income £5.73k £4.31k £7.39k £6.92k £7.56k
Total expenditure £6.36k £5.10k £8.32k £0 £7.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A