Financial history THE LAMBETH CONFERENCE

Charity number: 1121679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £260.83k £2.49m £3.41m £264.76k £489.58k
Total expenditure £79.32k £366.92k £696.20k £767.47k £699.58k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £2.49m £3.39m N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £3.83k £15.49k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £366.92k £696.20k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £600 £6.22k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A