Accounts and annual returns VISION REDBRIDGE CULTURE AND LEISURE

Charity number: 1122720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window