Trustees ST MARY'S JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH
Charity number: 1121608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELDHO KADAYATH PETER | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Akhil Joy | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
BINU VARKEY | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
LAIBY VINOD | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELDHO PETER | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
KURIAKOSE EDINJUKUZHIYIL | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
SURESH KOSHY | Trustee | 27 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
RAJU PAULOSE AMIKKARA | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOSE MATHEW | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.