Financial history The Five Islands Academy PTFA

Charity number: 1119793
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.81k £1.57k £1.97k £1.86k £1.07k
Total expenditure £1.34k £1.29k £1.19k £3.40k £542
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A